Case Information: 51367 | |||
Short Caption: | BURTON (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 60427 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C234299 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/02/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/02/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-08255 | |
04/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 08-08256 | |
04/08/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 08-08744 | |
04/11/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Judgement of Conviction filed in the District Court on 4/8/08. Due Date: 10 days. | 08-09046 | |
04/17/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 04/08/08. Judgment of Conviction. | 08-09596 | |
05/13/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/26/07, 11/27/07, 11/28/07, 11/29/07, 11/30/07, and 12/04/07. | 08-11964 | |
05/30/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30 days). | 08-13697 | |
06/20/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 30, 2008. | 08-15924 | |
07/02/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-16875 | |
07/02/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-16876 | |
08/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. | 08-20022 | |
08/13/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Robert E. Glennen, III. | 08-20870 | |
08/13/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Notice of Appearance to be served on Craig Mueller.) | 08-20872 | |
08/15/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall remove Craig Mueller as counsel for appellant. On August 13, 2008, Robert E. Glennen, III, filed a notice of appearance of behalf of appellant. Mr. Glennen shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file either a supplemental fast track statement pursuant to NRAP 3C(g) or a notice that no supplemental fast track statement will be filed. Respondent shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file a single fast track response that addresses the issues raised in both the fast track statement and the supplemental fast track statement, if one is filed. | 08-21150 | |
08/25/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Notice of Appearance. | 08-21884 | |
09/05/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Supplemental Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 9/11/08. Supplemental Fast Track Response due: 10/01/08. | 08-22953 | |
09/15/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-23765 | |
09/15/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Supplemental Fast Track Appendix. | 08-23766 | |
10/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 19 Page Fast Track Response. | 08-25600 | |
10/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. respondent filed a motion for leave to file a fast track response in excess of 10 pages. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track response and appendix received on October 3, 2008. | 08-26119 | |
10/10/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-25603 | |
10/10/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-25605 | |
05/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-11082 | |
06/02/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12757 | |
06/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/10/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2009. | 09-12757 |