Case Information: 51362 | |||
Short Caption: | DREW VS. EDWARDS-DETRICK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0702686 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/02/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ronda Drew (Second Judicial District Court check no. 15256). | ||
04/02/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-08189 | |
06/09/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-14578 | |
07/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-15444 | |
07/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2008. | 08-15444 |