judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILHELM VS. JINKS

Case Information: 36300
Short Caption:WILHELM VS. JINKSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0002982Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/16/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/16/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10355
06/16/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We note that appellant has failed to pay the filing fee mandated by NRS 2.250. This constitutes an independent basis for dismissal of this appeal.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12051
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13747
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/18/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 14, 2000. 00-13747