judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF KATHLEEN HORN-DALTON, AN EMPLOYEE OF SOUTHWEST WYOMING REHABILITATION CENTER: KATHLEEN E. HORN-DALTON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0276)
Case Number:S-07-0276Case Docketed On:12/03/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF KATHLEEN HORN-DALTON, AN EMPLOYEE OF SOUTHWEST WYOMING REHABILITATION CENTER: KATHLEEN E. HORN-DALTON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF KATHLEEN HORN-DALTON, AN EMPLOYEE OF SOUTHWEST WYOMING REHABILITATION CENTER: KATHLEEN E. HORN-DALTON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKathleen E. Horn-DaltonEthelyn (Lynn) Boak
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Brandon Wayne Snyder
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 14
Citation:200 P.3d 810

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/03/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/03/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/18/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/18/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution for Brandon W. Snyder, Special Assistant Attorney General to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
02/21/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/21/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/21/2008Brief - Appellant and copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
05/05/2008Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/12/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/27/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/03/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, district court index, certified docket sheets, and certificate; Volumes II-IV, Agency Record (no district court pleadings were designated by appellant)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/16/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/08/2008Order - Show cause why appeal should not be summarily affirmed or dismissedOrderShow causeFinal
10/09/2008Response/Objection - Other - show causeResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
10/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received Response to order to show causeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2008Order - Other - Discharging order to show cause, sanctioning appellant's counsel for failing to adequately designate the record, and order granting appellant's request for leave to file a supplemental designation of the recordOrderOtherFinal
10/21/2008Fees - Sanctions received - other; and received copy of supplemental designation of record.FeesSanctions received - otherFinal
10/23/2008Record - Supplemental record on appeal, two volumes. Numbered Volume V, original pleadings; Volume VI, transcript.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
02/05/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/11/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
02/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for attorney's fees and costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2009Event - Phone Call - Received phone call from Mike Causey. State will not be filing any objections to the motion for fees and costs.EventPhone CallFinal
02/24/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
02/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/27/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/25/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal