judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2799
A-2799
07/12/1950
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS HIGHWAY COMMISSION, ET AL.
EL PASO BUILDING CONSTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/12/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/01/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/11/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/12/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/29/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/11/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/25/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/21/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/19/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
07/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/12/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/29/1950Opinion issued
11/01/1950Brief on the Merits
10/11/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
09/12/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/29/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/11/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/25/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/21/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/19/1950Response to Petition
07/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/12/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Association of Commerce, East Texas Chamber of Commerce, South Texas Chamber of Commerce, West Texas Chamber of CommerceAmicus Curiae
El Paso Building Construction Trades CouncilRespondent
Texas Good Roads AssociationAmicus Curiae
Texas Highway Commission, et al.Petitioner
CITY OF AUSTIN, ET AL.Amicus Curiae
Robert Lee Bobbitt, et al.Amicus Curiae
City of El Paso, Travis White, City AttorneyAmicus Curiae
Ben H. PowellAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information