Case Information: 51359 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT (WILLIAMS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35559 , 45796 , 54027 , 56568 , 63636 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C124422 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition or in the Alternative, Mandamus. | 08-08158 | |
04/01/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 08-08159 | |
04/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/04/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 20 days. | 08-08462 | |
04/24/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 08-10240 | |
06/26/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate its order striking the State's notice of intent to seek the death penalty." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-16278 | |
06/26/2008 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Steven Owens, Chief Deputy District Attorney for service upon Judge Sally L. Loehrer. | 08-16447 | |
07/03/2008 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Sally Loehrer on July 1, 2008. | 08-16447 | |
07/10/2008 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. | 08-17648 | |
09/26/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 08-24930 | |
10/06/2008 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent (Real Party in Interest) Williams' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 08-25797 | |
10/21/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-25131 | |
10/21/2008 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/En Banc Reconsideration Pending. | ||
11/17/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | 08-29272 |