Case Information: 51358 | |||
Short Caption: | GONZALEZ-SOTO (JESUS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56328 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR071007 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/19/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-08155 | |
04/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court Order appointing counsel due: 35 days. | 08-10005 | |
05/02/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 28, 2008. | 08-10998 | |
05/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 08-11002 | |
05/06/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Attorney Karla Butko. | 08-11183 | |
05/14/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Same Order as filed on 5/2/08 (contains Certificate of Mailing). | 08-12177 | |
05/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Transcripts at Public Expense. | 08-12406 | |
05/27/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and to File Docketing Statement. Appellant's motion for Transcripts at Public expense is granted. Appellant is hereby declared exempt from the payment of reporter's fees. Transcript request form due 10 days. Docketing statement due 10 days. | 08-13186 | |
06/02/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-13854 | |
06/20/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Susan Culp stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/05/07. | 08-15925 | |
06/27/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Deborah Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/04/07. | 08-16531 | |
07/02/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Gail Willsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/3/07. | 08-16877 | |
07/02/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Gail Willsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/28/08. | 08-16893 | |
08/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. This matter warrants the conditional imposition of sanctions. Appellant's counsel: 15 days to pay $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. However, this sanction shall be automatically vacated if appellant's counsel files and serves the transcript request form or, alternatively, a motion to extend time, within ten days from the date of this order. | 08-21385 | |
08/20/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Counsel Explanation as Mandated by this Court on 08/19/08. | 08-21425 | |
08/28/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-22152 | |
08/28/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-3. | 08-22153 | |
09/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-25238 | |
10/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-27218 | |
11/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 08-29474 | |
11/19/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/06/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-11255 | |
06/02/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12799 | |
06/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/05/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 3, 2009. | 09-12799 |