Case Information: 51364 | |||
Short Caption: | CITY OF HENDERSON VS. BLITZ | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A532781 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/09/2008 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/02/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. (Check no. 1288 in the amount of $250.00 returned to Santoro, Driggs, Walch, Kearney, Holley & Thompson.) | ||
04/02/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-08213 | |
04/09/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. | 08-08847 | |
04/15/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-09363 | |
04/15/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. Due date: 10 days. | 08-09365 | |
04/15/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 08-09374 | |
04/21/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/23/08. | 08-09849 | |
04/24/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent: Mark L. Gentile, Esq. of the Gentile Law Group. | 08-10268 | |
09/19/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-24309 | |
10/06/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 08-25717 | |
11/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 08-28597 | |
11/17/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- PANEL-TH | 08-29244 | |
11/17/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |