Case Information: 51360 | |||
Short Caption: | CITY OF LAS VEGAS VS. AFIFI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A553581 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/09/2008 / Shirinian, Ara | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-08162 | |
04/04/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 08-08471 | |
04/09/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | 08-08853 | |
04/11/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 08-09116 | |
04/17/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-09611 | |
04/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. For Docketing Statement. | 08-09637 | |
04/21/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/29/08 To Court Reporter: Beverly Sigurnik. | 08-09875 | |
04/21/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 08-09877 | |
04/25/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 08-10407 | |
05/08/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Declaration of Mailing- Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 08-11439 | |
05/09/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/13/08. | 08-11611 | |
05/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-13561 | |
06/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Designating Appeal as Fast Track and Reinstating Briefing Pursuant to NRAP 3C. Upon further review, it has been determined that this appeal arises from a criminal matter. Court Recorder Sigurnik's certificate acknowledging delivery of the rough draft transcript due: 20 days. Fast track statement and appendix due: 50 days. Fn2[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] | 08-14192 | |
06/19/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Beverly Sigurnik stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/29/08. | 08-15727 | |
07/28/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-19400 | |
07/28/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 08-19401 | |
08/08/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time to File Fast Track Response. | 08-20586 | |
08/15/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. On August 8, 2008, the parties filed a stipulation extending the time for the filing of the fast track response by 30 days. We elect to treat the stipulation as a joint motion for an extension of time, and we grant the motion. Respondent shall have until September 17, 2008, to file the fast track response. | 08-21156 | |
09/17/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-24027 | |
09/17/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplemental. | 08-24030 | |
10/02/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn11[We decline to address the City's other assignments of error.] NNP08C-MC/WM/NS | 08-25548 | |
10/14/2008 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Respondent Afifi's Petition for Rehearing. | 08-26424 | |
10/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
10/14/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. | 08-26463 | |
10/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from William B. Terry, Chartered - check no. 010103. | ||
12/03/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 08-30735 | |
12/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-31192 | |
12/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/12/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 6, 2009. | 08-31192 |