Case Information: 51354 | |||
Short Caption: | MARRONE VS. KACZMAREK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A496970 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/10/2008 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/11/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Richard Harris Law Firm--check no. 17261. | ||
04/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-08110 | |
04/10/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. | 08-08916 | |
04/23/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 08-10180 | |
05/07/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11411 | |
05/07/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 08-11414 | |
05/13/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/19/08. | 08-11876 | |
05/23/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Dcoketing Statement served on Settlement Judge Trost. | 08-13140 | |
05/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-13558 | |
06/09/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-14484 | |
07/10/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days | 08-17578 | |
08/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. This matter warrants the conditional imposition of sanctions. Appellant: 15 days to pay $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. This sanction shall be automatically vacated if appellant files and serves the transcript request form or, alternatively, a motion to extend time, within ten days from the date of this order. | 08-21394 | |
08/21/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-21551 | |
09/08/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 9, 2008. | 08-23089 | |
10/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 11/7/08. | 08-26201 | |
11/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request by Motion). | 08-28257 | |
11/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Time. | 08-28709 | |
12/02/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time and Denying Motion to Dismiss. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 8, 2008. | 08-30597 | |
12/10/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-31451 | |
12/10/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 5. | 08-31453 | |
01/08/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-00596 | |
02/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 6, 2009. | 09-03416 | |
03/06/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request) | 09-05755 | |
03/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Due: April 6, 2009. | 09-06471 | |
03/19/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Time. | 09-06988 | |
04/02/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. respondents filed an opposition to the motion. As the opposition was filed after the order granting the motion, we will treat it as a motion for reconsideration. We deny the motion. Appellant's reply brief shall be due on April 6, 2009, as stated in the March 13 order. | 09-08361 | |
04/08/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-08796 | |
09/11/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 09-22143 | |
09/11/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-26797 | |
12/01/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-28516 | |
12/01/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2009. | 09-28516 |