Case Information: 51348 | |||
Short Caption: | WANG (YU) VS. CITY OF LAS VEGAS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C203857 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-07809 | |
04/04/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/16/07 To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. | 08-08525 | |
04/21/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/16/07. | 08-09847 | |
05/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. For Late Filing of Fast Track Statement. | 08-11850 | |
05/12/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. FILE PER ORDER OF 5/14/08. | 08-11851 | |
05/12/2008 | Appendix | Received Appendix. FILED PER ORDER OF 5/14/08. | 08-11852 | |
05/14/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on May 12, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12107 | |
05/14/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-11851 | |
05/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-11852 | |
06/03/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-13995 | |
06/03/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-14004 | |
09/18/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08C-MC/WM/NS. | 08-24133 | |
10/14/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-24773 | |
10/14/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/22/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 20, 2008. | 08-24773 |