Case: 07-23-00404-CV
07-23-00404-CV
10/27/2023
Divorce
Ashutosh Joshi
Nemica Kadel
No
3rd Court of Appeals
10/27/2023
03-23-00624-CV
7th Court of Appeals
10/27/2023
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | | ||
12/12/2023 | Corrected brief filed | Appellant |
| ||
11/27/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/06/2024 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||
02/13/2024 | Motion to vacate disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
02/12/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
01/29/2024 | Motion to vacate filed | | |||
01/24/2024 | Corrected motion requested | | |||
01/09/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted |
| ||
01/08/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
12/12/2023 | Corrected brief filed |
| |||
11/29/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
11/27/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Struck | | ||
11/20/2023 | Corrected brief requested | | |||
11/01/2023 | Email sent | | |||
10/30/2023 | Email sent | | |||
10/27/2023 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
10/27/2023 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |||
10/20/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||
10/20/2023 | Exhibits filed | | |||
10/20/2023 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||
10/19/2023 | Document filed | | |||
10/19/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
10/19/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
10/18/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||
10/13/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
10/10/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Joshi, Ashutosh | Appellant | Ashutosh Joshi |
Kedel, Nemica | Appellee | Tyler Pennington |
Trial Court Information
425th Judicial District Court
Williamson
Honorable Betsy F. Lambeth
22-1889-F425
Mandi Mikeska