Case Information: 51349 | |||
Short Caption: | SLAUGHTER VS. JOHNSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - R138422 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/31/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/31/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-07830 | |
03/31/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-07832 | |
06/13/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[ On March 31, 2008, appellant was issued a notice to pay the Supreme Court filing fee. It appears that appellant has not paid the filing fee. As such, appellant's failure to pay the filing fee constitutes an independent basis for dismissing this appeal. Additionally, appellant has not filed his civil proper person appeal statement, which was due on May 12, 2008. Appellant's failure to file the appeal statement is also an independent basis for dismissing this appeal.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-15110 | |
07/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-15505 | |
07/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 11, 2008. | 08-15505 |