Case Information: 49447 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36414 , 41365 , 47769 , 68187 , 68187-COA , 71469 , 71469-COA , 79756 , 79756-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C162028 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/02/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/15/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/15/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-10708 | |
05/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-11613 | |
08/02/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. | 07-17023 | |
08/02/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/14/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-24852 | |
12/12/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26379 | |
12/12/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2007. | 07-26379 |