Case Information: 49437 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO YOUNG | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D360193 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-10628 | |
05/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 07-10632 | |
05/24/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 05/14/07 w/Notice to Pay Filing Fee, Pilot Program Instructions and Forms addressed to Karen Taylor returned. No forwarding address. | ||
06/27/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Karen Taylor - money order no. 08739564798. | ||
07/19/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-15771 | |
07/26/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. w/attachments. | 07-16467 | |
07/30/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 07-16716 | |
08/07/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from appellant Karen Taylor in re: to Dismiss Appeal. | 07-17332 | |
08/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn4[In light of this order we deny, as moot, respondent's July 30, 2007 motion to dismiss this appeal.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC | 07-17375 | |
08/22/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Waive Filing Fee (rehearing fee.) | 07-18644 | |
08/22/2007 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. | 07-18645 | |
08/22/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
09/25/2007 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn2[Petitioner has requested this court to waive the rehearing filing fee without stating any gounds for a fee waiver. We therefore deny this request.] NRAP 40(c). SNP07-MG/MD/MC | 07-21136 | |
10/02/2007 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 07-21731 | |
10/23/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22142 | |
10/23/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/En Banc Reconsideration Pending. | ||
10/25/2007 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter re: Apology in Reference to En Banc Reconsideration. | 07-23547 | |
10/31/2007 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | 07-23941 | |
11/01/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2007. | 07-22142 |