judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FINN VS. ST. ROSE DOMINICAN HOSPITAL

Case Information: 51371
Short Caption:FINN VS. ST. ROSE DOMINICAN HOSPITALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A547480Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/09/2008 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/03/2008OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons.
04/03/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gary S. Fink--check no. 1517.
04/03/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-08365
04/09/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. 08-08848
04/30/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Docketing Statement. 08-10756
05/07/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on April 28, 2008. 08-11339
05/07/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-10532
05/21/2008Other Returned Mail. Order Granting Motion 5/7/08 to Carroll, Kelly, Trotter, Franzen & McKenna. Address updated per phone call to Robert McKenna. Remailed to corrected address. 08-12707
05/27/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Carroll, Kelly, Trotter, Franzen & McKenna. 08-13226
06/02/2008Other Returned Mail. Order filed 5/7/08 to Robert McKenna. Reconfirmed address with firm, added suite #. Remailed to corrected address. 08-13801
06/18/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled in September of 2008. 08-15585
06/20/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to a date in September 2008. 08-15894
09/10/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a partial settlement of this matter between Appellant and Respondent Edgar A. Faylona, M.D. The remaining parties will continue negotiations. Settlement Judge recommends that this appeal remain in the Settlement Program until October 15, 2008. 08-23361
11/04/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. Other than a partial settlement between appellants and Respondent Faylona, the remaining parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-28139
12/02/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellants and respondent Faylona have agreed to a settlement. The remaining parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix; 15 days to file motion or stipulation to dismiss as to Dr. Faylona. 08-30535
12/19/2008MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Partial Stipulation to Dismiss as to Respondents Faylona and Cancer & Blood Spepcialist only. 08-32233
12/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to the stipulation filed 12/19/08, this appeal is dismissed as to appellants and respondents Faylona and Cancer & Blood Specialist. The caption shall be modified accordingly. 08-32644
01/12/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. 09-00939
01/22/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/12/07, 3/12/08. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 09-01796
01/29/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Carroll Kelly Trotter Franzen & McKenna Law Firm. 09-02581
03/03/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60) days. 09-05318
03/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Opening Brief due: May 1, 2009. fn1[Although only Ralynn Finn moved for an extension of time to file the opening brief, we construe the motion as filed on behalf of all appellants.] 09-05879
04/28/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and for Abeyance of Briefing Schedule and for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (Appellants) 09-10469
05/26/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Suspending Briefing. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to (1) obtain counsel and cause counsel to enter an appearance in this court, or (2) inform this court in writing that they will be proceeding in proper person. We note that Ralynn Finn, as Administrator for the Estate of Betty Whalin, cannot proceed in proper person because a non-attorney cannot represent an estate. Finn, as administrator for the estate, must obtain counsel within 30 days. Briefing is hereby suspended pending further order of this court. 09-12960
06/29/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Michael R. Hall, Esq. 09-15973
06/29/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Notice of Appearance. Due date: 10 days. 09-15974
06/30/2009MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 09-16171
08/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Counsel to Properply Serve Notice of Appearance and Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. Due 10 days. 09-19249
08/19/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Notice of Appearance. 09-20184
08/19/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 09-20185
08/19/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Notice of Certificate of Service. 09-20186
09/17/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We grant the motion and dismiss ths appeal. The parties shall bear their own costs, if any." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. 09-22497
09/17/2009Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.