Case Information: 51378 | |||
Short Caption: | WALLACE VS. HARTFORD FIRE INS. CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0600236 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/09/2008 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Matthew L. Sharp, Ltd.--check no. 1707. | ||
04/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-08552 | |
04/09/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. | 08-08835 | |
04/17/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-09627 | |
04/25/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. Respondent Hartford Fire Insurance Company. | 08-10372 | |
06/09/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is scheduled for the following date: August 20, 2008 | 08-14530 | |
08/21/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 10/7/08 | 08-21537 | |
09/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-25057 | |
10/09/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 08-26115 | |
10/17/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Amended Report. This appeal is re-opened for further negotiations between appellants and Travelers. Conference scheduled for 10/28/08. Case settled between appellants and Hartford. | 08-26842 | |
11/25/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. Matter reopened between appellants and Travelers and thereafter settled by further negotiations. | 08-30101 | |
12/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 08-32298 | |
01/06/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 09-00201 | |
01/20/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- PANEL-TH | 09-01534 | |
01/20/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |