Case Information: 51574 | |||
Short Caption: | STARK (JOHN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 27617 , 33116 , 34969 , 36890 , 37486 , 44917 , 46833 , 63596 , 67579 , 67579-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C109793 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/05/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-11574 | |
06/02/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-13849 | |
06/09/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days | 08-14447 | |
06/27/2008 | Transcript Request | Received Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts Requested: 02/11/08. To Court Reporter: Sonia Riley. (FILED PER ORDER 07/10/08). | 08-16500 | |
07/02/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sonia Riley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/11/08. | 08-16882 | |
07/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to File request for Rough Draft Transcript. | 08-17124 | |
07/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the transcript request form previously received on June 27, 2008. | 08-17538 | |
07/10/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts Requested: 02/11/08. To Court Reporter: Sonia Riley. | 08-16500 | |
09/10/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-23403 | |
09/10/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-23405 | |
10/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-26427 | |
10/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 08-26428 | |
11/05/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-28256 | |
11/05/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/08/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-08843 | |
05/05/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-09621 | |
05/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 8, 2009. | 09-09621 |