Case Information: 55317 | |||
Short Caption: | VALENCIA, JR. (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47137 , 55325 , 62060 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 31368 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/23/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/25/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-01927 | |
02/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-04862 | |
03/23/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 8. | 10-07594 | |
03/23/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED."Fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-11847 | |
07/15/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-18148 | |
08/09/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19231 | |
08/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/17/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2010. | 10-19231 | |
08/30/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on June 14, 2010 and placed on the docket August 25, 2010 as Case No. 10-6068. | 10-22246 | |
11/05/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. | 10-29091 |