Case Information: 55318 | |||
Short Caption: | WOODS (MACK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C255782 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-01932 | |
01/25/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Bill Nelson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/29/09. | 10-03163 | |
02/10/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/06/09 and 07/15/09. | 10-03732 | |
03/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-05234 | |
03/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 1, 2010. | 10-05646 | |
04/01/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-08561 | |
04/01/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 1 | 10-08562 | |
04/01/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 2 | 10-08563 | |
04/01/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 3 | 10-08564 | |
04/19/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-10115 | |
09/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-23062 | |
10/04/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-25621 | |
10/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 11, 2010. | 10-25621 |