judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BYUN VS. BJ RANCHO INVS., INC.

Case Information: 51578
Short Caption:BYUN VS. BJ RANCHO INVS., INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A552776Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/13/2008 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/09/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hong & Hong Law Offices check no. 8015.
05/09/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-11599
05/09/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Emergency Motion for Affirmation of Automatic Stay of Summary Eviction Order. Filed via - fax. 08-11628
05/09/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Temporary Stay. We hereby temporarily stay enforcement of the order of summary eviction and exclusive possession, pending receipt and consideration of a repsonse to the motion for stay. Respondent's response due: 7 days. 08-11666
05/12/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Appeal Only. Representing appellant: Michael K. Wall and Kevin M. Sutehall of Hutchision & Steffen, LLC. 08-11706
05/12/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Emergency Motion for Affirmation of Automatic Stay of Summary Eviction Order. (Filed via fax on 05/09/08). 08-11707
05/12/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 08-11801
05/13/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Certificate of Mailing Order Granting Temporary Stay (fax from Nevada Supreme Court) filed 5/9/08. 08-11912
05/13/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost 08-11976
05/19/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Affirmation of Automatic Stay of Summary Eviction Order. 08-12497
05/19/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order. Submitted by attorney Kevin M. Sutehall. 08-12501
05/27/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. "Request leave to reply in support of their emergency motion for affirmation of automatic stay of summary evicition order." 08-13188
05/27/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. For Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. 08-13189
06/05/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing: Appellant's Motion for Leave to file Reply Brief served upon opposing counsel and settlement judge. 08-14231
06/09/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 08-14448
06/09/2008MotionReceived Response to Motion. Supplemental Response to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Affirmation of Automatic Stay of Summary Eviction Order. 09-00003
06/10/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-14663
06/10/2008MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Application for Leave of Court to File Supplemental Response to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Affirmation of Automatic Stay of Summary Eviction Order. 08-14677
06/11/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. we deny appellants' motion for a stay, without prejudice, and we vacate our May 9, 2008 order granting a temporary stay in this case. Fn2-[We grant respondents' June 10, 2008 motion to file a supplemental response and direct the clerk of this court to file respondents' supplemental response, provisionally received on June 9, 2008. ] 08-14856
06/11/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Supplemental Response to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Affirmation of Automatic Stay of Summary Eviction Order. 08-14859
06/16/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Application for Leave of Court to File Supplemental Response to Appellants' Emergency Motion for Affirmation of Automatic Stay of Summary Eviction Order. 08-15219
06/24/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellant's Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy. 08-16131
07/14/2008MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Appellants' Renewed Emergency Motion for Affirmation of Automatic Stay of Summary Eviction Order. (filed via fax) 08-17936
07/15/2008MotionFiled Motion for Stay. ORIGINAL - Appellants' Renewed Emergency Motion for Affirmation of Automatic Stay of Summary Eviction Order. (filed via fax on 07/14/08). 08-18101
09/02/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant: 15 days to show cause. Fn5 [We defer ruling on appellants' stay motion pending our resolution of this jurisdictional issue. We further note that the bankruptcy stay that was purportedly entered in the underlying case was lifted, according to appellants' renewed stay motion.] 08-22440
09/24/2008MotionFiled Motion. Hutchison & Steffen. 08-24658
10/06/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellant counsel Joseph Y. Hong, Esq. 08-25820
11/18/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The settlement proceedings are concluded and this appeal may proceed. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) shall remain suspended pursuant to this court's September 2, 2008 order to show cause. We grant the motions of Hutchinson & Steffen and Hong & Hong to withdraw as counsel of record. The clerk shall remove those firms from the docket of this appeal. It appears appellants continue to be represented by the Goodman Law Group. This court's order of September 2, 2008 directed appellants to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Fn1(in that order we deferred ruling on appellant's motion for stay pending our resolution of the jurisdictional issue]. Appellant's response was due by September 17, 2008. Appellant has also failed to file a docketing statement. Appellant: 10 days to file a response to our order to show cause and to file a docketing statement. 08-29410
12/05/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellant counsel Ross Goodman. 08-30975
01/08/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion to Withdraw and Directing a Response to the Order to Show Cause. We deny his motion to withdraw as counsel. Appellant: 10 days to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction and to provide a docketing statement. Respondents may file a reply within ten days from the date that appellant's response is served. Fn2 [We defer ruling on appellants' renewed stay motion pending our resolution of this jurisdictional issue.] 09-00470
01/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We conclude that appellants' failure to file their response to our order to show cause warrants the conditional imposition of sanctions. Ross C. Goodman: 15 days to pay of $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. These sanctions shall be automatically vacated if Goodman files and serves the response to our show cause order in that same period. Counsel cautioned. 09-02743
02/11/2009MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 09-03685
03/05/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We construe appellant's response as a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal and we grant the motion." Fn1 [In light of this order, we deny as moot any requests for relief pending in this appeal.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP. 09-05704
03/05/2009Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.