judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROWELL (LAMARR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51577
Short Caption:ROWELL (LAMARR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50845 , 59852 , 61750 , 64875 , 70671 , 70671-COA , 73722 , 73722-COA , 74175 , 74175-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C235579Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/09/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/09/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-11583
05/21/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/08/07, 9/24/07, 9/25/07, 9/26/07, 10/16/07, 10/30/07, 1/17/08, 3/04/08, and 4/03/08. To Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt/Lee Bahr/Bill Nelson. 08-12741
05/21/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-12742
06/02/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/08/07. 08-13905
07/10/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Lee Bahr to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. 9/24/07, 9/25/07, 9/26/07, and 1/17/08. Due date: 10 days. 08-17591
07/10/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Bill Nelson to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. 10/16/07, 10/30/07, 3/04/08, and 4/03/08. Due date: 10 days. 08-17593
07/15/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lee Bahr stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/24/07, 9/25/07, 9/26/07, and 1/17/08. 08-18156
08/21/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanctions of $250.00 due: 15 days or Court Reporter Bill Nelson's Certificate of Delivery or Motion due: 10 days. fn1[A copy of the transcript request from is attached to this order.] 08-21641
09/02/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 29, 2008. 08-22455
09/03/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Bill Nelson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No dates specified. 08-22637
10/02/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Requesting (45) days. 08-25503
10/23/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 13, 2008. Appellant has filed a proper person motion requesting leave to file an "appeal brief." Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, we deny the motion and direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, any future proper person documents submitted by appellant in this appeal. Appellant should address all concerns regarding this appeal to counsel, and shall proceed through counsel in the prosecution of this appeal. 08-27280
10/23/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to Submit Proper Person Appeal Brief; or for an order directing appellant's attorney to brief and argue appellant's Federal Constitutional Claim. 08-26090
11/17/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60 days). 08-29225
11/20/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief due 1/12/09. 08-29691
12/10/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. (copy of letter) from Court Reporter Bill Nelson addressed to Certified Court Reporters Board. Nos. 51577/50898/52104. 08-31478
12/30/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Nevada Certified Court Reporters Board regarding their investigation conducted against court reporter William K. Nelson. 08-32964
01/15/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Rowell's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Pages in Appendix and Need to Review Video's in District Court's Evidence Vault. 09-01218
01/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief due January 26, 2009. 09-01419
01/28/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-02381
01/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 7 days. 09-02745
02/09/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 38 pages. 09-03448
02/09/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-03449
02/09/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 09-03450
02/10/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 2 through 5. 09-03555
03/12/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (45 days). 09-06426
03/19/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Answering Brief due: April 27, 2009. 09-06972
04/30/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (1) day. 09-10802
04/30/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 33 Page Answering Brief. 09-10803
05/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on April 30, 2009. Reply Brief due: 30 days. 09-11212
05/06/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-10804
05/26/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. 09-12988
05/26/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to enlarge time to file the reply brief is approved. Due date: July 6, 2009. 09-12991
07/06/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for an Extension to File Reply Brief 09-16524
07/08/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Reply brief due July 20, 2009. 09-16705
07/16/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Rowell's Motion for Extension of Seven Days. 09-17574
07/24/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: August 3, 2009. 09-18220
08/04/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-18964
08/04/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix 09-18965
08/05/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the supplemental appendix received via E-Flex. 09-19053
08/05/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix 09-19054
08/20/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply Brief. 09-20320
08/20/2009BriefReceived Reply Brief. Amended Reply Brief (via E-Flex) FILED PER ORDER OF 8/28/09.
08/28/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the amended reply brief received via E-Flex on August 20, 2009. 09-20973
08/28/2009BriefFiled Amended Brief. Amended Reply Brief. 09-20974
01/29/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG 10-02560
02/23/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-03763
02/23/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/03/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on February 10, 2010 and placed on the docket as Case No. 09-9194.No. 10-05594
03/04/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 25, 2010. 10-03763
04/30/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. 10-11137