Case Information: 55315 | |||
Short Caption: | MCLAUCHLAN VS. DIST. CT. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55100 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A590972 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/22/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Emergency Petition for Writ and Temporary Stay of Resumption of January 25, 2010 Contempt Hearing. | 10-01916 | |
01/22/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee to be submitted via regular mail. | ||
01/25/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-01948 | |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Goold Patterson Ales & Day. Check No. 77236. | ||
02/19/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-02163 | |
02/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |