Case: A-11366
A-11366
03/25/1966
Application for Writ of Error
W. H. HODGES AND COMPANY OF ALEXANDRIA, INC.
DONLEY COUNTY STATE BANK OF CLARENDON, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
04/27/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
03/25/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/24/1966 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/20/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/05/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
05/25/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
05/25/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/27/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
03/28/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/25/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
W. H. Hodges and Company of Alexandria, Inc. | Petitioner | |
Donley County State Bank of Clarendon, Texas | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information