Case Information: 51563 | |||
Short Caption: | WALTON (MARVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C186335 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/08/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-11470 | |
05/08/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 08-11471 | |
05/16/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 08-12428 | |
06/11/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/20/04, 5/23/06, 6/06/06, 06/08/06, 3/13/08, 4/03/08, 4/04/08, and 4/10/08. To Court Reporter: Court Reporter for Dept. V. | 08-14820 | |
06/11/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Due date: 10 days. | 08-14823 | |
06/19/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 08-15722 | |
06/20/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/22/04, 5/23/06, 6/06/06, 6/08/06, 3/13/08, 4/03/08, 4/04/08, and 4/10/08. | 08-15915 | |
06/20/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 4/22/04, 5/23/06, 6/06/06, and 06/08/06. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. | 08-15916 | |
06/26/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-16403 | |
07/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Appellant: 30 days to file fast track statement and appendix. | 08-17095 | |
08/08/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 14 pages. Fast Track Statement. | 08-20535 | |
08/08/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-20537 | |
08/08/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-20538 | |
08/25/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-21899 | |
08/25/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-21902 | |
06/29/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-15948 | |
07/10/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Petition. | 09-17102 | |
08/06/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 09-19227 | |
08/12/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 09-19692 | |
10/20/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. | 09-25603 | |
11/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-27695 | |
11/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/25/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2009. | 09-27695 |