Case Information: 51579 | |||
Short Caption: | BRYAN (WILLIAM) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C99309 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-11612 | |
05/09/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 08-11613 | |
05/16/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/31/08. Court Reporter: Kristen Lunkwitz. Filed in district court on: 5/14/08. | 08-12430 | |
05/16/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 08-12433 | |
06/09/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-14535 | |
06/09/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-14537 | |
07/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent's counsel shall file and serve the fast track response within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. | 08-19407 | |
08/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30 days). | 08-20288 | |
08/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: September 8, 2008. | 08-20516 | |
09/10/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-23358 | |
02/26/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-04963 | |
03/24/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-06291 | |
03/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/01/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 27, 2009. | 09-06291 |