judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACKSON VS. RAFAEL

Case Information: 36304
Short Caption:JACKSON VS. RAFAELCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35665 , 36083 , 36432 , 36609 , 40893 , 41500 , 41723 , 41820 , 42357 , 42358 , 42583 , 45039 , 45408 , 45711 , 46398 , 46465
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A389572Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/19/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10411
07/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Athough appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-11950
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13783
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13783