judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK and LAURA VOSS v. BEVERLY B. GOODMAN

Case Heading (S-07-0297)
Case Number:S-07-0297Case Docketed On:12/27/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:MARK and LAURA VOSS v. BEVERLY B. GOODMAN
Full Title:MARK and LAURA VOSS, Petitioners, v. BEVERLY B. GOODMAN, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerMark VossDion James Custis
Mark Towne Voss
Laura M. Voss
PetitionerLaura VossDion James Custis
Mark Towne Voss
Laura M. Voss
RespondentBeverly B. GoodmanGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/26/2007Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
12/26/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/10/2008Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
01/18/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/23/2008Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
01/23/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal