judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: OTHA TRIMIAR, APLT

Case Information: 10-FM-1172
Short Caption:IN RE: OTHA TRIMIAR, APLTClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO2858-09Filed Date:09/17/2010

Opening Event Date:09/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/22/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOtha Trimiar N
Magin T. Puig MonsenNY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 17, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
10/27/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
10/27/2010DISMISSED
11/04/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL w/waiver attached
11/22/2010MANDATE ISSUED on 10/27/10 dismissal order.
11/29/2010ORDER DENY AS MOOT APPLT MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL
04/17/2014FiledArchived