Case Information: 55313 | |||
Short Caption: | VILLALTA VS. DEUTSCHE BANK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A587525 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/25/2010 / Saint-Aubin, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/22/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-01842 | |
01/22/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/25/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin | 10-02027 | |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from SullivanBrown Operating - check no. 1020. | ||
02/03/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a conference is scheduled for 2/15/10 | 10-02918 | |
02/04/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-03200 | |
02/05/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge. | 10-03420 | |
02/08/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to a date in mid-March. | 10-03536 | |
02/16/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to March 15, 2010. | 10-04024 | |
03/23/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to 4/7/10 | 10-07554 | |
05/06/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties continue to work out the details of an agreement. | 10-11630 | |
07/27/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 10-19359 | |
08/04/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to Settlement. | 10-20123 | |
08/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH | 10-20728 | |
08/11/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |