judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES (JEFFREY) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 51565
Short Caption:JONES (JEFFREY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 73077 , 73077-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 08EW000021BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/06/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/08/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-11483
05/15/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-12241
08/06/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 08-20393
08/06/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/21/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn11[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-29872
02/23/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 09-04555
03/20/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-05734
03/20/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/25/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 23, 2009. 09-05734