Case Information: 51534 | |||
Short Caption: | RICHARDSON CONSTR. VS. STATE OF NEVADA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A500783 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Pickering | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Hardesty for Chief Justice Pickering | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | 05/14/2008 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/09/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/05/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Parker, Nelson & Associates check no. 3595. | ||
05/05/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-11045 | |
05/14/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt | 08-12092 | |
05/30/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 08-13632 | |
06/03/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement conference program because this is an issue of public policy. | 08-13979 | |
06/12/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-14899 | |
06/25/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing. This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16182 | |
07/14/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-17911 | |
08/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-20625 | |
08/11/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-20626 | |
09/15/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-23758 | |
09/15/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 08-23760 | |
10/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 4, 2008. | 08-26905 | |
11/05/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-28268 | |
02/10/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Representing respondent Deputy Attorney General Kerry A. Benson in place of Doulgas E. Walther. | 09-03614 | |
03/09/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Pickering. | ||
03/09/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Pickering--voluntary recusal. | 09-05914 | |
03/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 09-05996 | |
03/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-JH/RP/MD | 09-11103 | |
06/02/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12760 | |
06/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/10/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2009. | 09-12760 |