Case Information: 55316 | |||
Short Caption: | GLOVER (JEFFEREY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53255 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - PC0004926 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/19/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/25/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-01926 | |
02/03/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1.4/10. To Court Reporter: Cecilia Thomas. | 10-02993 | |
02/08/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Cecilia Thomas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/4/10. | 10-03579 | |
02/22/2010 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Not typewritten. Corrected docketing statement due: 10 days. | 10-04677 | |
03/08/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-05994 | |
05/14/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-12561 | |
05/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | ||
06/01/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-14120 | |
06/15/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's CD-ROM version of the appendix due: 15 days. | 10-15472 | |
06/25/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to attorney David Neely returning the CD-Rs submitted on 5/24/10 and 6/21/10. The CDs should contain the appendix to the opening brief, but appear to be blank. | 10-16662 | |
07/01/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. (E-Filed in response to issued letter 6/25/10) | 10-17138 | |
07/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed. | ||
09/29/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-25155 | |
10/26/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-28041 | |
10/26/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
11/05/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2010. | 10-28041 |