judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAWRIMORE VS. LAWRIMORE

Case Information: 51556
Short Caption:LAWRIMORE VS. LAWRIMORECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41175
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D208271Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/13/2008 / Schofield, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/21/2011How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/07/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from David C. Amesbury, Inc. check no. 8248.
05/07/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-11401
05/13/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul H. Schofield 08-11970
05/19/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-12518
05/21/2008Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Respondent's Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement.s 08-12801
06/16/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for the week of July 14, 2008. 08-15278
06/24/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference will be held on 7/16/08. 08-16158
07/18/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 7/18/08 08-18511
07/25/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 7/29/08 08-19246
08/05/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 8/12/08 08-20182
08/15/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-21098
08/21/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-21623
09/16/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days-Appellant 08-23944
10/08/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-25981
10/14/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Response due from appellant: 10 days. Fn1 [The court defers ruling on appellant's October 8, 2008, motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief.] 08-26415
10/20/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellant Jessie Niles Lawrimore. 08-26919
11/14/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." fn3[Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is denied as moot.] NNP08G-MG/MC/NS 08-29009
12/09/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-29433
12/09/2008Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (REMITTITUR RECALLED/CASE REINSTATED PER ORDER FILED 04/07/2011).
12/18/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 11, 2008. 08-29433
02/24/2011MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Reinstatement of Appeal. 11-05773
03/10/2011MotionFiled Response to Motion Respondent's Response to Appellant's motion for Reinstatment of Appeal 11-07386
04/07/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Reinstating Appeal. We grant appellant's motion, recall the remittitur, and reinstate this appeal. Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. 11-10404
04/20/2011Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/22/07 and 3/14/08. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 11-11775
05/24/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/22/07. 11-15261
06/14/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/31/03, 6/10/03, 8/21/03, 5/23/06, 10/05/06, 4/24/07, 6/12/07, 7/09/07, 8/20/07, and 10/03/07. 11-17716
06/27/2011BriefFiled Opening Brief. 11-19040
06/27/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. 11-19042
08/02/2011MotionFiled Respondent's Request for Extension of Time to File (Answering) Reply Brief. 11-23268
08/12/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Respondent: Answering Brief and any appendix due: August 16, 2011. 11-24568
08/17/2011BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. 11-24983
08/17/2011AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix. 11-24993
08/18/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy -Respondent's Reply (Answering) Brief and Appendix. 11-25218
09/23/2011Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No Reply Brief Filed.
11/21/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. 11-35878
11/21/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/13/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP 12-29017
10/11/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-32225
10/11/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
10/23/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 17, 2012. 12-32225