Case Information: 51555 | |||
Short Caption: | RIO ALL SUITE HOTEL VS. KING | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A523820 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/14/2008 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP check no. 5786. | ||
05/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-11393 | |
05/14/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt | 08-12095 | |
06/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 08-13791 | |
06/18/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 8/12/08. | 08-15583 | |
06/19/2008 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Not typewritten and no proof of service. | 08-15681 | |
06/30/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-16621 | |
07/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Require Supersedeas Bond or Vacate Stay Order. | 08-19382 | |
07/28/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Motion to Require Supersedeas Bond or Vacate Stay Order. | 08-19383 | |
08/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Rio All Suite Hotel and Casino's Opposition to Motion to Require Supersedeas Bond or Vacate Stay Order. | 08-20016 | |
08/13/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Motion to Require Supersedeas Bond or Vacate Stay Order on Settlement Judge. | 08-20936 | |
09/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Direct District Court to Order Posting of Supersedeas Bond or Vacate Stay. We conclude that a bond is not necessary under the circumstances of this case and we deny the respondent's motion. | 08-23680 | |
09/22/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-24483 | |
09/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. | 08-24484 | |
09/30/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- PANEL-TH | 08-25291 | |
09/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |