judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TWO KINDRED SPIRITS VS. HEALTH PLAN OF NEV.

Case Information: 51553
Short Caption:TWO KINDRED SPIRITS VS. HEALTH PLAN OF NEV.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A561743Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/13/2008 / Schofield, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/07/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Two Kindred Spirits - M.O. #08-839443826.
05/07/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-11373
05/13/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul H. Schofield 08-11967
06/02/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 08-13786
06/16/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement of the matter is anticipated to be reduced to writing within ten (10) days. 08-15285
06/25/2008MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 08-16189
07/03/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK-TH [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-16914
07/03/2008Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.