judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOYCE (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51567
Short Caption:JOYCE (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51811
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C242118Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/08/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 08-11501
06/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is suspended. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-13932
06/11/2008MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 08-14821
07/21/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[On June 9, 2008, appellant submitted a proper person brief in support of his appeal. In light of this order, this court will take no action with regard to this document.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-18677
08/15/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-19832
08/15/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/26/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 18, 2008. 08-19832