Case Information: 51568 | |||
Short Caption: | NEAL (JERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR080293 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/08/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 08-11508 | |
06/16/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 24, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-15313 | |
06/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-16220 | |
07/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 24, 2008. | 08-17205 | |
07/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel on Appeal and Motion, Pursuant to NRAP 2, for Suspension of Filing Deadlines Pending this Court's Ruling on the Instant Motion. | 08-19231 | |
07/31/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to withdraw. The clerk of this court shall remove the Washoe County Public Defender's Office and add Washoe County Alternate Public Defender Patrick McGinnis as counsel for appellant. Mr. McGinnis: 10 days to file a rough draft transcript request form in the district court and file 2 file-stamped copies of the transcript request form and proof of service of the transcript request form in this court, or file a notice that no transcripts will be requested. 40 days to file the fast track statement and appendix. | 08-19972 | |
08/06/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-20362 | |
09/18/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. McGinnis: 10 days to filed the fast track statement and appendix or show cause. | 08-24137 | |
09/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File a Voluntary Dismissal Appeal or in the Alternative a Fast Track Statement and Joint Appendix. | 08-25106 | |
10/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: 21 days to file motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal or the fast track statement and appendix. | 08-25322 | |
10/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Motion and Stipulation. | 08-27062 | |
11/25/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 08-30065 | |
11/25/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |