Case Information: 51558 | |||
Short Caption: | ELIADES-LEDSTROM VS. DIST. CT. (ESTATE OF PONZIO) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53735 , 60684 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A545848 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/08/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus and Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings. | 08-11448 | |
05/08/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 08-11451 | |
05/08/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-11450 | |
05/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from McCormick, Barstow, Sheppard, Wayte & Carruth, LLP - check no. 003400. | ||
05/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Temporary Stay And Directing Answer. Due: 30 days. | 08-12317 | |
05/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Real Parties in Interest's Opposition to Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending the Court's Review of Petition for Writ. | 08-12352 | |
06/18/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Parties in Interest's Answer to Petitioner's Writ of Prohibition or in the Alternative Writ of Mandamus. | 08-15598 | |
06/18/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Real Parties in Interest's Appendix to Answer. | 08-15601 | |
07/07/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. RETURNED UNFILED- Pursuant to NRAP 21(b)- Petitioner's Reply to Answer of Real Parties in Interest to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. | 08-17262 | |
07/14/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Court Order to File Reply to Answer of Real Parties in Interest to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. | 08-18002 | |
08/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Leave to File a Reply. We grant the motion to file a reply and direct the clerk of this court to file petitioner's reply that was provisionally received in this court on July 14, 2008. | 08-21401 | |
08/19/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply to Answer of Real Parties in Interest to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. | 08-18003 | |
09/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition and vacate our May 16, 2008, order granting a temporary stay in this case." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-22863 | |
09/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-23499 | |
09/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |