Case Information: 51557 | |||
Short Caption: | JURBALA VS. TALCOTT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56219 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A513742 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/14/2008 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Pengilly Robbins Slater check no. 3197. | ||
05/08/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-11436 | |
05/14/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt | 08-12096 | |
05/15/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-12199 | |
05/15/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 08-12200 | |
05/22/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. | 08-12948 | |
05/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-13108 | |
05/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case should be removed from the settlement program. Meaningful settlement discussion cannot take place until Motion to Dismiss Appeal has been heard. | 08-13514 | |
06/02/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. We deny respondent's motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal. | 08-13882 | |
06/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-14223 | |
06/16/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This appeal should be removed from the program. | 08-15223 | |
06/25/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16241 | |
07/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-18202 | |
07/18/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days | 08-18517 | |
07/24/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/24/08. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. | 08-19099 | |
07/30/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellants' Renewed Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-19630 | |
09/12/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed." fn5[Respondents' motion for leave to file a reply to appellant's opposition to the renewed motion to dismiss appeal is denied as moot." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-23691 | |
10/07/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23881 | |
10/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/22/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2008. | 08-23881 |