Case Information: 51549 | |||
Short Caption: | COUNTS (KENNETH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48233 , 50576 , 50939 , 54272 , 55608 , 57217 , 63115 , 64757 , 67640 , 78081 , 78081-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C212667 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-11341 | |
05/07/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/22/08 and 1/23/08 Court Reporter: Renee Vincent Filed in district court on: 4/30/08. | 08-11342 | |
05/07/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/11/08 and 3/20/08 Court Reporter: Janie Olsen Filed in district court on: 4/30/08. | 08-11343 | |
05/13/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/22/08 and 1/23/08. | 08-11858 | |
05/15/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/22/08 and 1/23/08. Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. Filed in district court on: 4/30/08. | 08-12267 | |
05/22/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Janie Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/11/08 and 3/20/08. | 08-12939 | |
05/22/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 3/11/08 and 3/20/08. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. | 08-12940 | |
06/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Fast Track Statement. Granted: 15 pages. | 08-15565 | |
06/18/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-15566 | |
06/18/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols 1-17. | 08-15567 | |
07/10/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-17610 | |
03/27/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-07779 | |
04/21/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-08259 | |
04/21/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/30/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 24, 2009. | 09-08259 |