judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEAL (JERRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51570
Short Caption:NEAL (JERRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR072682Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/08/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 08-11543
06/16/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 24, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-15316
06/25/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-16221
07/07/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 24, 2008. 08-17192
07/25/2008Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 08-19238
07/25/2008AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 08-19239
08/05/2008Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 08-20267
01/14/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP Nos. 51569/51570/51571. 09-01172
02/10/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-01941
02/10/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/19/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 11, 2009. 09-01941