Case Information: 51569 | |||
Short Caption: | NEAL (JERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR080292 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/08/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 08-11540 | |
06/16/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 24, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-15324 | |
06/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-16230 | |
07/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 24, 2008 to file the fast track statement and appendix. | 08-17099 | |
07/25/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-19279 | |
07/25/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 08-19280 | |
08/05/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-20266 | |
01/14/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP Nos. 51569/51570/51571. | 09-01171 | |
02/10/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-01897 | |
02/10/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/19/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 11, 2009. | 09-01897 |