judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAWSON A. REECE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0296)
Case Number:S-07-0296Case Docketed On:12/26/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Niobrara CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DAWSON A. REECE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAWSON A. REECE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDawson A. ReeceDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 121
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/26/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/12/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
03/13/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/18/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/01/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/04/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/09/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/03/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/31/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal