judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDCARE MANAGEMENT, INC. V. WILLIAM BACH, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1171
Short Caption:EDCARE MANAGEMENT, INC. V. WILLIAM BACH, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB850-10Filed Date:09/10/2010

Opening Event Date:09/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/30/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdcare Management Inc.N
Kevin M. Colmey NN
AppelleeWilliam Bach N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeOlakitan Akinjagunla N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeRoosevelt Brandly N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeAngela Emmons Brule N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeFernando Daniels N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeMohammad Ghandi N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeJohn Kelly N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeJoe Nuni N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeJean Williams N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeJessica Wyatt N
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeTitilayo Adetu YPro SeN
AppelleeTilly Law FirmN
Elena M. Tilly NN
AppelleeElena M. Tilly NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/12/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
10/12/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
10/29/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
11/08/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been PREMATURELY FILED. See DC Code 11-721 (2001)... (OBNBST) (jl)
11/08/2010DISMISSED
11/30/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived