Case Information: 51536 | |||
Short Caption: | MACK VS. KUCKENMEISTER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0602713 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Parraguirre for Justice Hardesty | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/18/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/05/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Landon D. Mack check no. 2217. | ||
05/05/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-11061 | |
05/05/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. | ||
06/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. 60-Day Extension for Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-14455 | |
06/17/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Submitted by Landon Mack for Darren Roy Mack. | 08-15363 | |
07/24/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. appellant shall file and serve his civil proper person appeal statement within 60 days from the date of this order. We caution appellant that no further extensions of time will be granted absent unforeseeable or extreme circumstances. | 08-19168 | |
07/31/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Copy of letter addressed to Attorney Egan Walker. | 08-19892 | |
08/08/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Copy of letter from apppellant addressed to Attorney Kent Robison. | 08-20569 | |
09/19/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-24288 | |
10/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record and Granting Motion to File Briefs. Record in District Court Case No. CV0602713 due: 30 days. Appellant: 60 days to file an opening brief. Fn3 [On July 31, 2008, and August 8, 2008, appellant filed various documents regarding correspondence between him and respondents' attorney. As these filings do not request any relief, no action is required.] | 08-25306 | |
10/24/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. | 08-27385 | |
11/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement/Opening Brief. | 08-30078 | |
12/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 1/26/09. | 08-30986 | |
12/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Respondent Michael Fondi. | 08-31600 | |
12/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Answering Brief due: January 28, 2009. | 08-32460 | |
01/26/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Randall S. Kuckenmeister, as Administrator of the Estate of Charla Mack's Answering Brief. | 09-02182 | |
01/28/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Michael Fondi, Guardian Ad Litem on Behalf of Erika Mack. | 09-02422 | |
01/28/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent Michael Fondi's Appendix to Respondent Michael E. Fondi's Answering Brief. | 09-02423 | |
02/18/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-04249 | |
02/18/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/25/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART." SNP10-RP/MD/KP | 10-05022 | |
03/23/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-05832 | |
03/23/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/30/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 26, 2010. | 10-05832 |