judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TALBOTT VS. ASPEN FAMILY MEDICINE

Case Information: 51535
Short Caption:TALBOTT VS. ASPEN FAMILY MEDICINECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0500464AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/13/2008 / Greiner, JillSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/03/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of White Meany & Wetherall, LLP check no. 29320.
05/05/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-11054
05/13/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jill I. Greiner 08-11972
05/14/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 08-12140
05/20/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-12669
05/20/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -docketing statement. 08-12670
05/23/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. 08-13013
06/03/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 9/10/08. 08-13971
06/09/2008Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Respondent's Carson Medical Group and Merritt W. Dunlap, M.D.'s Response to Appellants' Docketing Statement. 08-14505
06/19/2008MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply to Respondent Carson Medical Group and Merritt W. Dunlap, M.D.'s Response to Appellants' Docketing Statement. 08-15755
06/19/2008Other Other. Received. Appellant's Reply to Respondent Carson Medical Group and Merritt W. Dunlap, M.D.'s Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (FILED PER ORDER 11/13/08) 08-15761
09/23/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-24608
11/13/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order for Dismissal with Prejudice filed on May 9, 2008. Due Date: 10 days. 08-28868
11/13/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. We grant appellants' motion for leave to file a reply to the response to the docketing statement. The clerk shall file the reply received on June 19, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-28958
11/13/2008Other Other. Filed Appellants' Reply to Respondent Carson Medical Group and Merrit W. Dunlap, MD's Response to Appellants' Docketing Statement. 08-15761
11/25/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 08-30131
02/04/2009Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of Order of Dismissal with Prejudice filed in the district court on May 9, 2008. 09-03051
02/09/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-03506
02/09/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 5. 09-03509
03/12/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents Aspen Family Medical, LLC's Answering Brief. (Respondent Aspen Family Medical & Colleen Lyons). 09-06376
03/13/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Carson Medical Group's Substantive Joinder to Respondent Aspen Medical, LLC's Answering Brief Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 28(i). 09-06500
04/10/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-09086
11/03/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 09-26823
11/03/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/25/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG 10-05069
03/15/2010MotionFiled Motion. Respondents' Itemized and Verified Bill of Costs. 10-06678
03/25/2010MotionFiled Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Respondents' Itemized and Verified Bill of Costs. 10-07872
06/07/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Costs in Part. We direct the clerk to issue an itemized statement of costs in the amount of $54.12 for insertion in the remittitur and to issue the remittitur forthwith. 10-14514
06/07/2010RemittiturIssued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $54.12. 10-14574
06/07/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $54.12. 10-14576
06/07/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/14/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 9, 2010. 10-14576