judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARDS VS. NAT. CREDIT ADJUSTERS

Case Information: 51531
Short Caption:EDWARDS VS. NAT. CREDIT ADJUSTERSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 52323 , 59081 , 59406 , 59550
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A551105Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/03/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/02/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
05/02/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 08-10956
05/02/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 08-10957
05/08/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to be Exempted from Civil Appeals Pilot Program. 08-11488
05/15/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Enlargement of Time to Pay Filing Fee. 08-12231
06/04/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Paul DS Edwards - check no. 1090.
06/10/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 08-14619
06/12/2008Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/05/08 and 5/20/08. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez 08-15011
06/23/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Record, Exempting Appeal from Pilot Program, and Denying Motion for Extension of Time As Moot. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant has moved to exempt this appeal from the pilot program for civil appeals. We grant appellant's motion for the limited purpose of filing an opening brief. Opening Brief due: 60 days. Respondents need not file an answering brief unless directed to do so by this court. Appellant's motion for enlargement of time to pay the filing fee is denied as moot. 08-16040
07/03/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 08-17050
08/04/2008Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Certificate of Mailing - Transcripts dated 02/05/08 and 05/20/08. 08-20177
08/06/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff-Appellant to File Opening Brief. 08-20346
08/20/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Emergency Motion for Order Vacating the District Court's Order Granting Defendants' Examination to Judgment Debtor and for Requiring Production of Documents. 08-21433
08/25/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. 08-21921
08/25/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Third Amended Notice of Appeal. 08-21924
09/18/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Fourth Amended Notice of Appeal. 08-24229
09/22/2008MotionFiled Stipulation. 08-24432
09/29/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Approving Stipulation. Opening Brief due: October 3, 2008. fn2[We deny as moot appellant's August 6, 2008, motion for extension of time. We further deny as moot appellant's August 20, 2008, motion, as the examination sought to be stayed has apparently already occurred.] 08-25142
10/06/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-25793
10/06/2008AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vol. A-B. 08-25794
04/03/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/08/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Full Briefing. Respondents: 30 days to file and serve the answering brief. Reply brief due 30 days from service of answering brief. 09-11495
06/09/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 26, 2009. 09-14380
06/10/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Objection to Granting Respondent's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Opening Brief. 09-14515
06/30/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-16162
06/30/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 09-16165
07/27/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 3, 2009. 09-18273
08/05/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-19086
08/05/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 09-19093
08/12/2009MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Ex Parte Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief and Appellant's Reply Appendix. 09-19617
08/19/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Opposition to Respondents Ex Parte Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief and Appellant's Reply Appendix. 09-20177
08/24/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration. On June 10, 2009, appellant filed an objection to the June 9, 2000, order granting respondents' motion. We construe appellant's objection as a motion for reconsideration, which we deny. 09-20527
07/19/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief and Appendix. 10-18325
09/28/2010Order/DispositionalOrder Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. We reverse the portion of the district court's summary judgment as to Edwards' TCPA claim. The district court's summary judgment is affirmed in all other respects. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." 10-24966
10/04/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Bill of Costs. 10-25700
10/12/2010MotionFiled Motion. Petition for Publication of the Court's Decision. 10-26651
10/21/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Publication. 10-27477
10/25/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. This court concludes that appellate costs are not properly taxed pursuant to NRAP 39 against any party in this matter. The clerk shall not insert costs in favor of any party in the remittitur. 10-27864
10/25/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-27884
10/25/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/17/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 3, 2010. 10-27884