Case Information: 51550 | |||
Short Caption: | CALFEE (JAKE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C236354 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-11348 | |
05/07/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/28/08. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. | 08-11351 | |
05/13/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/28/08. | 08-11963 | |
06/02/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant: 20 days to show cause. Briefing suspended. | 08-13798 | |
06/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-15231 | |
06/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Amended Judgment of Conviction filed 5/5/08 in district court. Due Date: 10 days | 08-15358 | |
06/25/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 5, 2008. | 08-16212 | |
07/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal and briefing may proceed. Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file a fast track statement and appendix. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. | 08-17583 | |
08/18/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-21247 | |
08/18/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-21248 | |
09/10/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-23428 | |
02/11/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the amended judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-03753 | |
03/10/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-05596 | |
03/10/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/19/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 13, 2009. | 09-05596 |