Case Information: 51545 | |||
Short Caption: | RODRIGUEZ (ANDRES) VS. DIST. CT. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - R93194 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/06/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/06/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Peition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-11292 | |
06/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer. Respondent's Answer to Writ Petition due: 30 days. fn1[The clerk of this court is directed to change the caption in this case to conform to the caption on this order.] | 08-15092 | |
07/03/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 08-16958 | |
07/11/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We deny the Petition." SNP08-JH/RP/MD fn1[The filing fee for this petition has already been waived; accordingly, no action on petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, provisionally received on May 6, 2008, is necessary.] | 08-17721 | |
08/05/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-19759 | |
08/05/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |